MA H3805 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to liens upon real estate for nonpayment by municipal lighting plants. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to municipal lighting plants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-12-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/14/2021 from 01:30 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-05-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H104 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H120 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H139 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S2146 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S960 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H123 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2194 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S45 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S58 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S56 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S2716 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Postponed to Monday, August 1, 2022
H120 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H139 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
S2146 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S960 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
H123 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2194 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S45 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S58 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S56 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S2716 (Similar To) 2022-06-16 - Postponed to Monday, August 1, 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3805 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3805.pdf |