MA H3813 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1693
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-07 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-07 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting wages of employees who receive wages through an electronic wage card
Title
Protecting wages of employees who receive wages through an electronic wage card
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-07 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2016-06-23 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2015-10-21 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2015-10-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-10-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2015-10-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-10-15 | House | New draft of H1693 and H3261 |
2015-10-15 | House | Reported from the committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1693 (Replaces) 2015-10-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
S1980 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3765 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - New draft substituted, see H3972
S2023 (Similar To) 2015-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3812 (Similar To) 2015-10-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2034 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - New draft substituted, see S2054
S1980 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3765 (Similar To) 2016-01-27 - New draft substituted, see H3972
S2023 (Similar To) 2015-10-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3812 (Similar To) 2015-10-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2034 (Similar To) 2015-11-18 - New draft substituted, see S2054
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3813 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3813.pdf |