MA H3829 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 32 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 32 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act authorizing the town of Needham to place a question on the ballot authorizing the town grant certain licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises By Ms. Garlick of Needham, a petition of Denise C. Garlick (by vote of the town) that the town of Needham be authorized to issue additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premise. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Needham to place a question on the ballot authorizing the town grant certain licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 32 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-02-12 | House | Enacted |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-02-10 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-01-30 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-01-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-01-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/21/2014 from 04:00 PM-04:30 PM in A-2 |
2014-01-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/21/2014 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2014-01-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-12-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3829 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3829.pdf |