MA H383 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3812
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3812
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3812
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Dunstable be authorized to issue licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Providing for alcoholic beverage licenses in the town of Dunstable
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3812 |
2021-05-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/20/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3812 (Replaced by) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 392 of the Acts of 2022
H3907 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3861 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4115
H3890 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4116
H3933 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
H3936 (Similar To) 2022-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 139 of the Acts of 2022
H4065 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4086 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4664
H4132 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3712 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2022
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H4101 (Similar To) 2021-12-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 110 of the Acts of 2021
H3907 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3861 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4115
H3890 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4116
H3933 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
H3936 (Similar To) 2022-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 139 of the Acts of 2022
H4065 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4086 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4664
H4132 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3712 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2022
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H4101 (Similar To) 2021-12-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 110 of the Acts of 2021
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H383 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H383.pdf |