MA H3861 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4115
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4115
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4115
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Wellesley be authorized to grant certain licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages and the sale of wines and malt beverages in said town. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Wellesley to grant certain licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-20 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4115 |
2021-06-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/28/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-06-07 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3890 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4116
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H3712 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2022
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
H3907 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3933 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
H4065 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4086 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4664
H4115 (Replaced by) 2021-11-16 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4260
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S612 (Similar To) 2021-11-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4260 (Similar To) 2021-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 113 of the Acts of 2021
H5016 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 186 of the Acts of 2022
H4845 (Similar To) 2022-07-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5016
H3831 (Similar To) 2021-11-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4240
H3712 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 7 of the Acts of 2022
H380 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3811
H3715 (Similar To) 2021-05-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3813
H3907 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3933 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
H4065 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4086 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4664
H4115 (Replaced by) 2021-11-16 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4260
S199 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S612 (Similar To) 2021-11-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4260 (Similar To) 2021-12-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 113 of the Acts of 2021
H5016 (Similar To) 2022-08-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 186 of the Acts of 2022
H4845 (Similar To) 2022-07-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3861 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3861.pdf |