MA S612 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the Elm Bank Reservation. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the Elm Bank Reservation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-03 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-04-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/04/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H3861 (Similar To) 2021-09-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4115
H3140 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S353 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S827 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S1431 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1706 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2257 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2375 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3140 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S353 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2755
S827 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S1431 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1706 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1347 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2257 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2375 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S612 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S612.pdf |