MA H3833 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 19 of the Acts of 2009
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 19 of the Acts of 2009
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Validate betterment assessments in the town of Dracut
Title
Relative to betterments in the town of Dracut.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-10 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 19 of the Acts of 2009 | |
2009-06-04 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Read, rules suspended, read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2009-06-03 | Enacted | |
2009-05-26 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2009-05-20 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2009-05-18 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for for the next sitting for a second reading | |
2009-05-14 | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-01-20 | Senate concurred | |
2009-01-20 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Revenue |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/House/H3833 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=883&generalCourtId=2 |