MA H3858 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4073
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-6)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4073
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4073
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit commercial solicitation to mobile electronic devices. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Prohibiting Robocalls to all Mobile Telephone Devices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-07 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4073 |
2012-01-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/25/2012 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-12-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-12-05 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
2011-12-01 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4073 (Replaced by) 2012-07-26 - Read and referred to the Senate Committee on Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H3858 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=17644&generalCourtId=1 |