MA H3874 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - Report accepted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - Report accepted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act authorizing the city of Taunton to grant additional liquor licenses By Representative O'Connell of Taunton and Senator Pacheco (by request), a joint petition of John M. McCaul (with the approval of the mayor and municipal council) that the city of Taunton be authorized to issue additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages and wine and malt beverages not to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Taunton to grant additional liquor licenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | House | Report accepted |
2014-06-16 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2014-05-19 | House | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-03-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/18/2014 from 03:00 PM-03:30 PM in A-1 |
2014-03-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/18/2014 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3874 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3874.pdf |