MA H3883 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to local zoning ordinances or by-laws. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Facilitating local approval of inclusionary zoning
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-07-11 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/16/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-06-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-06-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H187 (Similar To) 2020-10-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5052
S314 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S94 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S818 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S794 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2369 (Similar To) 2020-03-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H1814 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
H180 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H1284 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2443 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S314 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S94 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S818 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S794 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2369 (Similar To) 2020-03-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H1814 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5127
H180 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H1284 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2443 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3883 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3883.pdf |