MA H3920 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H871
Note: Legislation replaced by S2081
Note: Legislation replaced by S2081
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on December 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-28 - Accompanied S2081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-28 - Accompanied S2081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To protect access to confidential healthcare
Title
To protect access to confidential healthcare
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-28 | Senate | Accompanied S2081 |
2015-12-23 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2015-12-23 | House | New draft of H871 |
2015-12-23 | House | Reported from the committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H871 (Replaces) 2015-12-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3920
S2081 (Replaced by) 2016-02-25 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2138
S2231 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2381
S2230 (Similar To) 2016-07-13 - New draft substituted, see S2409
S2232 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2276 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - New draft substituted, see S2517
S2081 (Replaced by) 2016-02-25 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2138
S2231 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2381
S2230 (Similar To) 2016-07-13 - New draft substituted, see S2409
S2232 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2276 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - New draft substituted, see S2517
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3920 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3920.pdf |