MA S2081 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on December 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2138
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2138
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to protect access to confidential healthcare,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2081).
Title
To protect access to confidential healthcare
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Senate | New draft substituted as amended, see S2138 |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read second |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 25, 2016 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Order relative to subject matter adopted |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see S2138 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Accompanied by H3920 |
2015-12-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2015-12-24 | Senate | New draft of S557 |
2015-12-24 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S557 (Replaces) 2015-12-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H3920 (Replaces) 2016-01-28 - Accompanied S2081
S2138 (Replaced by) 2016-12-27 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S649 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1136 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S542 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1565 (Similar To) 2015-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3639
H3920 (Replaces) 2016-01-28 - Accompanied S2081
S2138 (Replaced by) 2016-12-27 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S649 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1136 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S542 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1565 (Similar To) 2015-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3639
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2081 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2081.pdf |