MA S1136 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2199
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for consumer access to and disclosure of complementary and alternative health services. Public Health.
Title
Providing for consumer access to and disclosure of complementary and alternative health services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2199 |
2015-11-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/17/2015 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S2199 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S1231
S649 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S2081 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2138
S2138 (Similar To) 2016-12-27 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S603 (Similar To) 2015-10-01 - Substituted by S2022, amended
S1230 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1565 (Similar To) 2015-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3639
H81 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4614
S649 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S2081 (Similar To) 2016-02-25 - New draft substituted as amended, see S2138
S2138 (Similar To) 2016-12-27 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S603 (Similar To) 2015-10-01 - Substituted by S2022, amended
S1230 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1565 (Similar To) 2015-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3639
H81 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4614
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1136 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1136.pdf |