MA H3942 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on February 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-16 - Signed by the Governor. Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on February 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-16 - Signed by the Governor. Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Wagner of Chicopee, a petition of Joseph F. Wagner and others (with the approval of the mayor and city council) that the Chicopee Contributory Retirement System be authorized to allow certain members to purchase creditable service for military service. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the retirement benefits of certain employees of the city of Chicopee
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Wagner [D] | Sen. Donald Humason [R] | Sen. James Welch [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] |
Sen. Eric Lesser [D] | Rep. Michael Finn [D] | Rep. Thomas Petrolati [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | Signed by the Governor. Chapter 27 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-02-12 | House | Enacted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day fro the next session |
2018-01-22 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2017-12-11 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2017-12-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-12-11 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-12-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-10-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-10-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-10-05 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3300 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2576 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2575 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3282 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2553 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4933 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 406 of the Acts of 2018
H2576 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2575 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3282 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H2553 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4933 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 406 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3942 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3942.pdf |