MA H3942 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-07 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-07 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program countable income. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program countable income
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-07 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2023 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-06-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-06-26 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S98 (Similar To) 2024-03-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3942 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3942.pdf |