MA H3948 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H896
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the DHY Clean Waters Community Partnership for the towns of Dennis, Harwich and Yarmouth
Title
Establishing the DHY Clean Waters Community Partnership for the towns of Dennis, Harwich and Yarmouth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2019 | |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2019-10-02 | House | Enacted |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-09-30 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2019-08-19 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-07-08 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-07-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-07-08 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-07-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-07-01 | House | New draft of H896 |
2019-07-01 | House | Reported from the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H896 (Replaces) 2019-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3948
H3636 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3635 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2020
H3680 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2020
H3636 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3635 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2020
H3680 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3948 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3948.pdf |