MA H896 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3948
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3948
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3948
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the DHY clean waters community partnership, an inter-municipal agreement for waste water management in the towns of Dennis, Harwich, and Yarmouth. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Establishing the DHY Clean Waters Community Partnership for the towns of Dennis, Harwich and Yarmouth
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. William Crocker [R] | Sen. Julian Cyr [D] | Rep. Sarah Peake [D] |
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3948 |
2019-03-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/02/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H3636 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3635 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2020
H3680 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2020
H3948 (Replaced by) 2019-10-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2019
H3635 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 29 of the Acts of 2020
H3680 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 11 of the Acts of 2020
H3948 (Replaced by) 2019-10-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 88 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H896 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H896.pdf |