MA H3964 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-22 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-22 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Salvador A. Bolanos, an employee of the Parole Board. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Salvador A. Bolanos, an employee of the parole board
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-22 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-07-18 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-07-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-07-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-07-16 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-07-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-07-03 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2019-07-02 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H3849 (Similar To) 2019-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 56 of the Acts of 2019
H3952 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H3816 (Similar To) 2019-06-17 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H3913 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2019
H2376 (Similar To) 2019-06-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2019
S1541 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2019
H2369 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2302 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H4151 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 116 of the Acts of 2019
H4156 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 108 of the Acts of 2019
S2415 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2020
H4237 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2020
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2020
S2442 (Similar To) 2020-01-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3952 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H3816 (Similar To) 2019-06-17 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H3913 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2019
H2376 (Similar To) 2019-06-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2019
S1541 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2019
H2369 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2302 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H4151 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 116 of the Acts of 2019
H4156 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 108 of the Acts of 2019
S2415 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2020
H4237 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2020
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2020
S2442 (Similar To) 2020-01-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3964 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3964.pdf |