MA H3982 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 99 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 99 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing the terms of certain bonds encouraging the improvement, expansion and development of military installations in the Commonwealth.
Title
Providing for the terms of certain bonds to be issued by the commonwealth for the improvement, expansion and development of military installations
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-14 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 99 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-05-12 | House | Enacted |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-05-05 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2014-04-24 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-04-10 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-04-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-04-10 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-04-09 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-04-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-03-25 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3982 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3982.pdf |