MA H3990 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4656
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4656
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4656
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to air quality monitoring for new gas pipeline facilities in the Commonwealth. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to air quality monitoring for new gas pipeline facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4656 |
2016-02-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/11/2016 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-02-01 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4656 (Replaced by) 2016-09-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H385 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H382 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H146 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4120
H191 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H1321 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H385 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H382 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H146 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4120
H191 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H1321 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3990 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3990.pdf |