MA H3990 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4583
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4583
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4583
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission (including members of the General Court) relative to the creation of a state-wide licensing board to license, prosecute and hold accountable club sports facilities. Education.
Title
Relative to club sports coaching staff
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-20 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4583 |
2023-11-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/13/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-07-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-07-13 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4583 (Replaced by) 2024-05-20 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3990 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3990.pdf |