MA H4 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4720
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-07 - Amendment adopted (as recommended by the House committee on Ways and Means), see H4720
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-07 - Amendment adopted (as recommended by the House committee on Ways and Means), see H4720
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
So much of the recommendations of the State Auditor (House, No. 3) as relates to reconciling inconsistent statutory audit schedules. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Reconciling inconsistent statutory audit schedules
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-07 | House | Amendment adopted (as recommended by the House committee on Ways and Means), see H4720 |
2016-11-07 | House | Read second |
2016-11-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-11-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2016-11-07 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2016-11-07 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a bill with the same title, see H4720 |
2016-04-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-04-13 | House | Reported on a part of H3 |
2015-11-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2015 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4720 (Replaced by) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 463 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4.pdf |