MA H4008 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 110 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 110 of the Acts of 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The committee of conference on the disagreeing votes of the two branches with reference to the Senate amendment of the House Bill making appropriations for the fiscal year 2017 to provide for final deficiencies and for certain other activities and projects (House, No. 3979), reports, in part, recommending passage of the accompanying bill (House, No. 4008).
Title
Making appropriations for the fiscal year 2017 to provide for supplementing certain existing appropriations and for certain other activities and projects
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-03 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 110 of the Acts of 2017 | |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2017-11-02 | House | Enacted |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2017-11-02 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Committee of conference report accepted, in concurrence |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-11-02 | House | Committee of conference report accepted |
2017-11-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2017-11-02 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-11-02 | House | Reported on a part of H3979 |
2017-11-02 | House | Reported from the committee of conference |
Same As/Similar To
H3979 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Reported, in part, by H4008
S3 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - See H3601
S2076 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - See H3601
S2177 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Reprinted as amended, see S2179
S2179 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4160 (Similar To) 2018-02-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2018
H4242 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Text of an amendment, see H4160
H4284 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1 (Similar To) 2017-04-10 - Reported in part, see H3600
H72 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3599 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3830 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4514 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 90 of the Acts of 2018
H4930 (Similar To) 2018-10-29 - For actions on the sections returned with recommendations of amendments, see H4940 for sections 59 and 60
H4946 (Similar To) 2018-10-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 277 of the Acts of 2018
H5009 (Similar To) 2019-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 368 of the Acts of 2018
S3 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - See H3601
S2076 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - See H3601
S2177 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Reprinted as amended, see S2179
S2179 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4160 (Similar To) 2018-02-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2018
H4242 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Text of an amendment, see H4160
H4284 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1 (Similar To) 2017-04-10 - Reported in part, see H3600
H72 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3599 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3830 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4514 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 90 of the Acts of 2018
H4930 (Similar To) 2018-10-29 - For actions on the sections returned with recommendations of amendments, see H4940 for sections 59 and 60
H4946 (Similar To) 2018-10-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 277 of the Acts of 2018
H5009 (Similar To) 2019-01-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 368 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4008 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4008.pdf |