MA H4242 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4160
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Text of an amendment, see H4160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Text of an amendment, see H4160
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Similar Bills
Title
Similar Bills
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Text of an amendment, see H4160 |
Same As/Similar To
H4160 (Replaced by) 2018-02-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 24 of the Acts of 2018
H72 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3775 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2017
S2194 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - See H3979
H4231 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3448 (Similar To) 2017-03-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2017
H4284 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4382 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Accompanied H4514
H4514 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 90 of the Acts of 2018
H72 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3775 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2017
S2194 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - See H3979
H4231 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3448 (Similar To) 2017-03-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 5 of the Acts of 2017
H4284 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4382 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Accompanied H4514
H4514 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 90 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4242 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4242.pdf |