MA H4011 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4526
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4526
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-11-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4526
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Patrick of North Andover, a petition of [PETITIONERS LIST] [BACKING TEXT]. [COMMITTEE].
Title
Relative to Certain Reforms and Corrective Changes Relative to the Massachusetts Department of Transportation
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-30 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4526 |
2012-07-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-07-17 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday, July 31, 2012 |
2012-07-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-05-21 | House | Reported, in part, by H4109 |
2012-05-21 | House | House concurred |
2012-05-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Reporting date on the residue of H4011 extended to Friday, June 29, 2012 |
2012-04-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4526 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4011 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=116596&generalCourtId=1 |