MA H402 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-13 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to alternative proteins and to develop a master plan of recommendations for fostering the appropriate expansion of protein innovation and the alternative protein industry. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Resolve providing for an investigation and study by a special commission relative to protein innovation in Massachusetts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2024-03-28 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Rules |
2024-03-04 | House | Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2023-06-20 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/20/2023 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-06-20 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/20/2023 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H4540 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4632 (Similar To) 2024-05-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4743 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Published as amended, see H4758
H4758 (Similar To) 2024-06-17 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4785 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4632 (Similar To) 2024-05-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4743 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Published as amended, see H4758
H4758 (Similar To) 2024-06-17 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4785 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H402 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H402.pdf |