MA H4037 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 37-2)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-11 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a new draft, see S2334
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-11 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a new draft, see S2334
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide regulatory reform to promote job growth. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Providing regulatory reform to promote job growth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-11 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a new draft, see S2334 |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-05-21 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday, June 30, 2012 |
2012-05-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-05-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2012 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2012-04-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-04-04 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4037 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=91749&generalCourtId=1 |