MA H4071 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 143 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 143 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Fitchburg be authorized to continue the employment of Kevin D. Roy as fire chief of the fire department of said city. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Fitchburg to employ Kevin D. Roy as fire chief beyond the statutory retirement age
Sponsors
Rep. Stephan Hay [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 143 of the Acts of 2019 | |
2019-12-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2019-12-05 | House | Enacted |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2019-11-07 | House | Read third (title change) and passed to be engrossed |
2019-10-07 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-10-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-10-02 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-09-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-09-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-09-12 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3747 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4334
S2419 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - New draft substituted, see S2693
S2419 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - New draft substituted, see S2693
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4071 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4071.pdf |