MA S2419 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2693
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-07 - New draft substituted, see S2693
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-07 - New draft substituted, see S2693
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize removing an easement interest in a certain portion of parkland located at 0 Elm Street in the City of Fitchburg from the protection of Article 97 of the Constitution. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Authorizing removing an easement interest in a certain portion of parkland located at 0 Elm Street in the City of Fitchburg from the protection of Article 97 of the Constitution
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Tran [R] | Rep. Stephan Hay [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2693 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Read third (title changed) |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2019-11-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H3747 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4334
H4071 (Similar To) 2019-12-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 143 of the Acts of 2019
S2693 (Replaced by) 2020-07-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 122 of the Acts of 2020
H4071 (Similar To) 2019-12-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 143 of the Acts of 2019
S2693 (Replaced by) 2020-07-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 122 of the Acts of 2020
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2419 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2419.pdf |