MA H4094 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4465
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 33-3)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4465
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4465
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the board of elementary and secondary education to develop or implement the common core standards. Education.
Title
To ensure quality education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4465 |
2014-06-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2014 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-1 |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-05-15 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Education |
2014-04-14 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4465 (Replaced by) 2014-09-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4094 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4094.pdf |