MA H4124 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Livingstone of Boston and Senator Boncore, a joint petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Jay D. Livingstone and Joseph A. Boncore that a certain pavilion shelter on the Charles River Esplanade in the city of Boston be designated as the Priebatsch pavilion. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Designating a certain pavilion shelter on the Esplanade in the city of Boston as the Priebatsch Pavilion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 38 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-03-04 | House | Enacted |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and order to a third reading |
2020-01-13 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-11-18 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-18 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-18 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-11-14 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-10-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-10-07 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
2019-09-25 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H864 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
H863 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5070
H2767 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S1483 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2020
H741 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
S2385 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H863 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5070
H2767 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S1483 (Similar To) 2020-06-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 94 of the Acts of 2020
H741 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
S2385 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4124 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4124.pdf |