MA H4149 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4419
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4419
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4419
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to television broadcasts or other video images while operating a motor vehicle. Transportation.
Title
Relative to split-screen technology
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-21 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4419 |
2014-08-21 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4419 |
2014-07-22 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Transportation |
2014-07-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-07-22 | House | Committee recommended ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-06-02 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4419 (Replaced by) 2014-09-04 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4149 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4149.pdf |