MA H4149 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Hearing scheduled for 04/12/2016 from 11:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Hearing scheduled for 04/12/2016 from 11:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to violations for passing a stopped or stationary waste or recycling collection vehicle on a public way. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to speed limitations near waste or recycling collection vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. James Arciero [D] | Rep. Hannah Kane [R] | Rep. David Muradian [R] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] |
Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/12/2016 from 11:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-30 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4149 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4149.pdf |