MA H4157 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4238
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4238
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4238
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Foxborough be authorized to grant two additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Foxborough to grant two additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4238 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-04-04 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4238 (Replaced by) 2016-10-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 286 of the Acts of 2016
H69 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H2447 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H307 (Similar To) 2016-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H2446 (Similar To) 2015-05-07 - Accompanied H2517
H539 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H69 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H2447 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H307 (Similar To) 2016-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H2446 (Similar To) 2015-05-07 - Accompanied H2517
H539 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4157 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4157.pdf |