MA H4158 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
Pending: House Bills in the Third Reading Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
Pending: House Bills in the Third Reading Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Rehoboth be authorized to convey a certain parcel of town owned land in said town. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Rehoboth to transfer a conservation easement on a certain parcel of land
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2016-07-30 | Senate | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-30 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2016-06-09 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-04-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-04-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-04-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-04-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-04-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/12/2016 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-04-04 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H203 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H3016 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H873 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1845 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4732 (Similar To) 2017-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 372 of the Acts of 2016
H3016 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H873 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1845 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4732 (Similar To) 2017-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 372 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4158 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4158.pdf |