MA H4163 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4083
Note: Legislation replaced by H4841
Note: Legislation replaced by H4841
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on November 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-07 - New draft substituted, see H4841
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-07 - New draft substituted, see H4841
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to DCF legislative reporting reform
Title
Relative to DCF legislative reporting reform
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-07 | House | New draft substituted, see H4841 |
2020-07-07 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2020-07-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-07-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2020-07-07 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2020-07-07 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill, see H4841 |
2019-11-14 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-11-04 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2019-11-04 | House | New draft of H4083 |
2019-11-04 | House | Reported from the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H4083 (Replaces) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4163
H151 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
S39 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2532
H2344 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H4841 (Replaced by) 2020-07-09 - Published as amended, see H4852
H151 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5088
S39 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2532
H2344 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H4841 (Replaced by) 2020-07-09 - Published as amended, see H4852
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4163 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4163.pdf |