MA H4171 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H276
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 275 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 275 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the maximum storage charges on motor vehicles involuntarily towed
Title
The maximum storage charges on motor vehicles involuntarily towed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 275 of the Acts of 2010 | |
2010-07-31 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | |
2010-07-31 | Enacted | |
2010-07-31 | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-07-31 | Rules suspended | |
2010-07-31 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | |
2010-07-30 | Read; and referred to the Senate Committee on Ethics and Rules | |
2010-07-29 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-07-29 | Rules suspended | |
2009-09-23 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2009-09-16 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading | |
2009-07-23 | Read; and referred to the House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2009-07-23 | New draft of H276 | |
2009-07-23 | Reported from the committee on Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H276 (Replaces) 2009-07-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4171
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.mass.gov/legis/186history/h04171.htm |
Text | http://www.mass.gov/legis/bills/house/186/ht04/ht04171.htm |