MA H4172 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4960
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the retirement group for public safety officers, police officers or public safety officials of the Department of Mental Health, Department of Public Health or Department of Developmental Services. Public Service.
Title
Recategorizing DMH, DPH, and DDS police
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-05 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4960 |
2021-10-18 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-09-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4960 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4172 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4172.pdf |