MA H4175 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 321 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 321 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Somerville be authorized to amend the form of petitions accompanying statements of candidates relative to non-partisan municipal elections in said city. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to municipal elections in the city of Somerville
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-29 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 321 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-11-21 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-11-21 | House | Enacted |
2016-11-17 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2016-11-17 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-10-11 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-10-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-10-11 | Senate | Read |
2016-10-06 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2016-06-15 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-06-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-06-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-05-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-04-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/13/2016 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-04-06 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H2917 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H1627 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H501 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4297
H2075 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H2184 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H1627 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H501 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4297
H2075 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H2184 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4175 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4175.pdf |