MA H4202 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission (including members of the General Court) relative to the bulk purchase of epinephrine auto-injectors. Public Health.
Title
Relative to the bulk purchase of Epinephrine Auto-Injectors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-30 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-12-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-11-12 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
2019-11-07 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
S1286 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
H463 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1843 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5090
H1871 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H499 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H463 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1843 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5090
H1871 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H499 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4202 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4202.pdf |