MA H4202 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5348
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-3-1)
Status: Introduced on September 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to waivers for non-fault overpayments of certain unemployment insurance benefits. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to waivers for non-fault overpayments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-13 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5348 |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday July 15, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-04-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 13, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 10:30 AM-04:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-10-12 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-10-04 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
2021-09-27 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H1984 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied S1164
S741 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1164 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1273 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied S741
H1327 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5174
H3098 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H5348 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S741 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1164 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1273 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied S741
H1327 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5174
H3098 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H5348 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4202 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4202.pdf |