MA H4224 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1670
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on July 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislationfor legislation to further regulate utility companies,
Title
Relative to utility service call centers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-07-18 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2012-07-02 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-07-02 | House | New draft of S1670, H3047 and H3048 |
2012-07-02 | House | Reported from the committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S1670 (Replaces) 2012-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4224
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4224 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=118899&generalCourtId=1 |