MA S1670 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4224
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4224
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4224
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to utility service call centers. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to utility service call centers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-02 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4224 |
2012-05-14 | House | House concurred |
2012-05-14 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday, June 15, 2012 |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2011-05-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/04/2011 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-01-24 | House | House concurred |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H4224 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/Senate/S1670 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=13607&generalCourtId=1 |