MA H4232 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Gordon of Bedford, a petition of Kenneth I. Gordon (by vote of the town) that all positions within the government of the town of Bedford subject to the civil service law be exempt from any provisions pertaining to age limits. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the maximum age requirement for firefighters for the town of Bedford
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday June 30, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/16/2024 from 09:00 AM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only |
2023-12-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-12-26 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H3935 (Similar To) 2023-12-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4201 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2894 (Similar To) 2024-08-01 - Laid before the Governor
H4954 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Senate concurred
H4962 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Adopted
H4201 (Similar To) 2024-03-14 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2894 (Similar To) 2024-08-01 - Laid before the Governor
H4954 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Senate concurred
H4962 (Similar To) 2024-07-31 - Adopted
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4232 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4232.pdf |