MA H4237 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3901
Note: Legislation replaced by H4537
Note: Legislation replaced by H4537
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H4537
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-21 - New draft substituted, see H4537
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying eligibility for the earned income tax credit
Title
Clarifying eligibility for the earned income tax credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | House | New draft substituted, see H4537 |
2016-07-21 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2016-07-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-07-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting with the amendment pending |
2016-07-21 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2016-07-21 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4537 |
2016-05-05 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-05-05 | House | New draft of H3901 |
2016-05-05 | House | Reported from the committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3901 (Replaces) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4237
H4537 (Replaced by) 2016-07-21 - Ordered to a third reading
S1958 (Similar To) 2015-07-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1959 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2282
H3639 (Similar To) 2015-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3779 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3771 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4537 (Replaced by) 2016-07-21 - Ordered to a third reading
S1958 (Similar To) 2015-07-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1959 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - New draft substituted, see S2282
H3639 (Similar To) 2015-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3779 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3771 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4237 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4237.pdf |