MA H425 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H412
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the suspension, revocation or cancellation of professional or occupational certificates, registrations or licenses for default on educational loans. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
To keep college graduates working
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-07-13 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-05-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2022-03-09 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-03-09 | House | Accompanied by H412 |
2021-05-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H524 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5004
H412 (Replaces) 2022-03-09 - Accompanied H425
H412 (Replaces) 2022-03-09 - Accompanied H425
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H425 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H425.pdf |