MA H524 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5004
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5004
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5004
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to economic impacts of loan forgiveness programs to ensure that college graduates stay, work, and build businesses in the Commonwealth. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.
Title
Relative to a loan forgiveness task force
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] |
Rep. Steven Howitt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5004 |
2021-09-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/05/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies |
Same As/Similar To
H2883 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S744 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H1316
H425 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1320 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4694
H5004 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S744 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H1316
H425 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1320 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4694
H5004 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H524 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H524.pdf |