MA H4272 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing for recall elections in the town of North Brookfield. Election Laws. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to providing for recall elections in the town of North Brookfield
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-06-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-06-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-05-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-21 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 28, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday March 19, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S2444 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3575 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2024
H3575 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2024
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4272 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4272.pdf |