MA S2444 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on September 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 7 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for recall elections in the town of Granby. Election Laws. [Local approval received]
Title
Providing for recall elections in the town of Granby
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-13 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-21 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 28, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-04 | House | House concurred |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 28, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-11-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-09-11 | House | House concurred |
2023-09-07 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
H3575 (Similar To) 2024-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2024
H4272 (Similar To) 2024-06-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4272 (Similar To) 2024-06-27 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2444 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/S2444.pdf |