MA H4283 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3249
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Accompanied S2445
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Accompanied S2445
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to HIV screening and prevention
Title
Relative to HIV screening and prevention
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Accompanied S2445 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-06 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2018-03-06 | House | New draft of H3249 |
2018-03-06 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H3249 (Replaces) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4283
H1165 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S1333 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H846 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2445 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1165 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S1333 (Similar To) 2018-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H846 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2445 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4283 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4283.pdf |